+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:58PM.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Children and Family Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Children and Family Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (6)
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (14)
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 54
May 6, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
April 12, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
April 12, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
February 23, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 23, 2016: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 23, 2016: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
January 26, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 26, 2016: Children and Family Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2016: House Children and Family Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor