+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Failed
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Townsend moved that the House reconsider HB 2451 within the next 14 days. Motion passed by v/v.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Failed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 11:12AM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 35
February 7, 2017: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 7, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor