+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 120
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Amendment: MAPS - W/D
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
2449pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 6
June 18, 2009: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
February 5, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 5, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor