+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 11:12AM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 22, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 26
February 8, 2017: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 8, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor