+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Veterans and Military Affairs
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Biggs
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Biggs floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2448gov
Senate Fact Sheet
Biggs floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 16, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
June 16, 2009: Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
February 5, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 5, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor