+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass.
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
March 6, 2023: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 6, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 28, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 28
January 19, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 15
January 19, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 19, 2023: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 10