+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- JUD - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
May 7, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 20
January 25, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 25, 2016: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor