+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Held
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate second read
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Pratt
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:00 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Government: Withdrawn
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Pratt Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Pratt Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
January 20, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 20, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor