+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation Committee: do pass.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation Committee.
- Senate Government Committee: withdrawn.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Bowers moved that the House reconsider HB 2445 on Thursday, February 25th 2016. Motion passed by v/v.
- Third read in House: Failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to INS - Livingston - passed
- INS - passed as am
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Insurance Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Insurance Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (5)
Insurance
House Proposed Amendment
Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to INS - Livingston - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
May 7, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2016: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2016: Senate Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 25, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
February 18, 2016: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 1, 2016: House Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 1, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 1, 2016: Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor