+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Water and Energy
- Senate first read
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture, Water and Lands
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
February 12, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2015: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 28, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor