+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate first read
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: TRANS - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to TRANS - Biggs
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Biggs Floor amendment, reference to the Transportation Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Biggs Floor amendment, reference to the Transportation Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 23, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor