+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
- House concurred.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- TRANS (ref Bill) adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:10PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 1
May 6, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
March 30, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 30, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2016: Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2016: Senate Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 4, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 4, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1