+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee: do pass.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- GHE - passed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
Government and Higher Education
House Proposed Amendment
Government and Higher Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
February 16, 2016: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 16, 2016: Commerce and Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 16, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 8, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
February 8, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor