+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 93
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pmobject
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:02 pm
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-17 nrra
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2014: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 4
February 25, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2014: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 30, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor