+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 26, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 152
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 3:05 pmobject
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: ENV - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to ENV - Barnes
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Environment: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Barnes Floor amendment; reference to the ENVIRONMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Environment
House Adopted Amendment
Barnes Floor amendment; reference to the ENVIRONMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
3-11 nripd
Senate Fact Sheet
Environment
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2010: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2010: Environment: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor