+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:05PM.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2021: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 11, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 27, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 13
January 27, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor