+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
- House concurred.
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Rules (ref GOV)
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Biggs flr amend (ref GOV) (sub RULES) adopted
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- SUB Floor Amend to CFA - Farnsworth - passed
- CFA
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Children and Family Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Children and Family Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (14)
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Children and Family Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Children and Family Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref GOV) (sub RULES) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
SUB Floor Amend to CFA - Farnsworth - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Children and Family Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
March 21, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 56
March 21, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
March 17, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
March 17, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 1, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2016: Government: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 25, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 25, 2016: Children and Family Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: House Children and Family Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor