+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Thorpe Floor Amend - Stevens
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Thorpe Floor Amend Stevens - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill Thorpe passed as amended
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 27
January 29, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2