+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 184
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: INS
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Insurance: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
March 30, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 6
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 24, 2015: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
February 23, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 29, 2015: Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 29, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor