+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:15 pmobject
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
- House second read
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 3, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 21, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor