+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 238
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
- House final read: Passed
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Melvin, Mccomish, Pancrazi
- Recommendation: that the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions.
- Senate reports to conference committee
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- House reports to conference committee
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Conference committee recommended
- House appointed: Gowan, Livingston, Mach
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CEM (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: McGuire flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gowan
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (15)
McGuire flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gowan Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
McGuire flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gowan Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
4-22 cem_aspassedconference
Senate Fact Sheet
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 23, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 7
April 23, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
April 21, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
March 3, 2014: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 27, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2014: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor