+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- Final disposition: Failed in House on final passage
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- House final read: Failed
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Pearce flr amend (ref JUD)
- Amendment failed: Cheuvront flr amend (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: Pearce flr amend (ref Bill)
- COW motion
- Sen lopez to include the cheuvront flr amend
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: MAPS
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (12)
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment; referene to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment; referene to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
July 1, 2009: House final read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 20
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 7
June 10, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
May 6, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
February 10, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor