+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 308
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
February 12, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 29, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor