+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 11
February 7, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
February 7, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8