+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
- Final disposition: None
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
- House final read: Passed
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Waring, Arzberger, Leff
- Recommendation: that the House accept the Senate amendments and the bill be further amended.
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- House appointed: Barto, Farley, Yarbrough
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Conference committee recommended
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Barto
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Barto Floor Amendment, Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Barto Floor Amendment, Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
5-9 as vetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
2-28caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-26 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
May 3, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
April 10, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2007: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 5
January 23, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2007: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor