+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Jud
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 19, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
January 29, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9