+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:55PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 1, 2021: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor