+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - McGuire
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Montenegro
- COW motion
- Mcguire to include the mcguire floor amendment to the bill - passed
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
McGuire Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Montenegro Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
McGuire Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Montenegro Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 5, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2