+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate first read
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: SUB Floor Amend to AWL - Barton
- Amendment substituted: AWL
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture, Water and Lands
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Agriculture, Water and Lands
House Proposed Amendment
SUB Floor Amend to AWL - Barton - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Agriculture, Water and Lands
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2015: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 29, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor