+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Ed
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Third read: Passed
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Education: Withdrawn
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
January 30, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
January 30, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor