+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 143
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Retirement and Rural Development: Do pass
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Retirement and Rural Development
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:00 pm
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2426rrd
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2009: Retirement and Rural Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
June 9, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2009: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 5, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 5, 2009: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor