+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 101
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 3:05 pm
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-15 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 14, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
March 2, 2010: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
January 25, 2010: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor