+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 20
- Action: Signed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment failed: Lopez flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Crandall flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Yee flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:14 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandall flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandall flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-5 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
March 26, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
March 21, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2013: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 22, 2013: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor