+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 285
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Driggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: JUD
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to JUD - Smith
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
David Burnell Smith substitute floor amendment to the Judiciary Committee amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
David Burnell Smith substitute floor amendment to the Judiciary Committee amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-21 approp_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
April 19, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 21, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 4
January 24, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor