+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 192
- Action: Signed
On April 22, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 2:35 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-11 nripd
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 21, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2010: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 20, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2010: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor