+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 197
- Action: Signed
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment failed: Lopez flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (15)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-30 ed_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
April 7, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2011: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
January 24, 2011: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
January 24, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor