+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 216
- Action: Signed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: HHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:15 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 31, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 29, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
January 20, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 20, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor