+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Government
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: GHE
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Government - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Higher Education
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government and Higher Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2015: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 3, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 20, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor