+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 30, 2019: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor