+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 3, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 214
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Gray L flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:00 pmobject
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: HHS
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Young Wright
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Gray L flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Young Wright Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Young Wright Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Gray L flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 27, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 23, 2010: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 22, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 20, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 20, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor