+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 23, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 138
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:35 pm
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: TI
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2010: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 23, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
January 19, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 19, 2010: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor