+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 57
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment failed: Schapira flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 12:46 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: BI
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Banking and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
3-11 bi
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2011: Banking and Insurance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
January 24, 2011: Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 24, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor