+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 56 e
- Action: Signed
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hb 2410 substituted for sb 1223. motion carried.
- Miscellaneous motion
- 0 0 0 0
- Senate miscellaneous motion: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Withdrawn
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:10 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: HEIR
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
House Proposed Amendment
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
House Adopted Amendment
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
House Adopted Amendment
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 24, 2011: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 24, 2011: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 24, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor