+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Held
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Failed to pass
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: TI
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2015: Transportation: Failed to pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
January 29, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 29, 2015: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor