+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 120
- Action: Signed
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: GR (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Finance: Withdrawn
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ERA
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Employment and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Employment and Regulatory Affairs
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Government Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Government Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
3-8 gr_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Government Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-28 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
March 28, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 2
January 17, 2012: Employment and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1