+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Held
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Senate first read
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:54 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
- Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Technology and Infrastructure
- House first read
+ − Amendment
2-20 ge-jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 18, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 22, 2014: Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6