+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 115
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:35 pm
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: JUD
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to JUD - Vogt
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Vogt Substitute Floor Amendment to the Judiciary Committee Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
3-17 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
Vogt Substitute Floor Amendment to the Judiciary Committee Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor