+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: COM
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to COM - Crandall
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Substitute Floor amendment to the Commerce Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Substitute Floor amendment to the Commerce Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-22 fiir
Senate Fact Sheet
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2007: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1