+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Failed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 23
March 1, 2016: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2016: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 25, 2016: House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2