+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Final disposition: Held awaiting House action on Senate amendments
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GE (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Griffin flr amend (ref GE)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: COM
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to COM - Carter
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (14)
Griffin flr amend (ref GE) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Carter SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the COMMERCE Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Carter SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the COMMERCE Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref GE) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 30, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2013: Government and Environment: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
January 22, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor